Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 11/17/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 11/17/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 11/17/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 11/17/2009
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 11/17/2009
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 11/17/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 11/17/2009
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 11/17/2009
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 11/17/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 11/17/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 11/30/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 12/02/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 12/04/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 12/04/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 12/15/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 12/15/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 12/21/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 12/21/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 12/21/2009
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 12/21/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 12/22/2009
Sen. Kirk, Paul Grattan, Jr. [D-MA] 12/22/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 12/24/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 01/20/2010
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 01/20/2010
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 01/20/2010
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 01/25/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 01/25/2010
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 02/09/2010
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 02/09/2010
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/09/2010
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 02/23/2010
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/10/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 03/10/2010
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/10/2010
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/10/2010
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 03/10/2010
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 03/10/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 04/14/2010
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/19/2010
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/19/2010
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 05/20/2010
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/25/2010
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/20/2010