Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 11/17/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 11/17/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 11/17/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 11/17/2009
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 11/17/2009
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 11/17/2009
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 11/17/2009
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 11/17/2009
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 11/17/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 11/17/2009
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 11/17/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 11/17/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 11/17/2009
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 11/17/2009
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 11/17/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 11/18/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 11/18/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 11/18/2009
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 11/19/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 11/30/2009
Sen. LeMieux, George S. [R-FL] 12/22/2009