Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 11/18/2009
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 11/18/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 11/18/2009
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 11/18/2009
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 11/18/2009
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 11/18/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 11/18/2009
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 11/18/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 11/18/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 11/18/2009
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 12/04/2009
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 12/07/2009
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 12/07/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 12/10/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 12/10/2009
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 12/21/2009
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 01/21/2010
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 02/23/2010
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 02/24/2010
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 03/01/2010