Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 11/21/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 11/21/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 11/21/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 11/21/2009
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 11/21/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 11/21/2009
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 11/21/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 11/21/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 11/21/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 11/21/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 11/21/2009
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 11/21/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 11/21/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 12/01/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 12/10/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 02/09/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 02/23/2010
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 03/10/2010
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/12/2010
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/29/2010