There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (11)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

CALM Act
Commercial Advertisement Loudness Mitigation Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

CALM Act
Commercial Advertisement Loudness Mitigation Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

CALM Act
Commercial Advertisement Loudness Mitigation Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

CALM Act
Commercial Advertisement Loudness Mitigation Act

Short Titles as Introduced

CALM Act
Commercial Advertisement Loudness Mitigation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to regulate the volume of audio on commercials.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
12/15/2010Became Public Law No: 111-311. (TXT | PDF)
12/15/2010Signed by President.
12/03/2010Presented to President.
12/02/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 11/30/2010 H7720)
09/29/2010Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/29/2010By Senator Rockefeller from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 111-340.
09/28/2010Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Rockefeller with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
12/08/2009Introduced in Senate

All Actions (24)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/15/2010Became Public Law No: 111-311. (TXT | PDF)
12/15/2010Signed by President.
12/03/2010SenatePresented to President.
12/02/2010-6:00pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/02/2010-6:00pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 11/30/2010 H7720)
12/02/2010-6:00pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7899)
11/30/2010-6:40pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Terry objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
11/30/2010-6:31pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2847.
11/30/2010-6:31pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7720-7721)
11/30/2010-6:31pmHouseMs. Eshoo moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
11/15/2010-6:17pmHouseHeld at the desk.
11/15/2010-2:03pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/30/2010SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/29/2010SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/29/2010SenateThe committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
09/29/2010SenateS.Amdt.4687 Amendment SA 4687 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/29/2010SenateS.Amdt.4687 Amendment SA 4687 proposed by Senator Durbin for Senator Whitehouse. (consideration: CR S7763-7764; text: CR S7764) To deem operators and distributors who maintain equipment and software in compliance with the FCC regulations to be in compliance with those regulations.
09/29/2010SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7763-7764; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S7763-7764)
09/29/2010SenateBy Senator Rockefeller from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 111-340.
09/28/2010SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 625.
09/28/2010SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Rockefeller with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
06/09/2010SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
12/08/2009SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
12/08/2009SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S12710-12711)

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 12/08/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 12/15/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 12/16/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 12/18/2009
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 12/22/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/17/2010
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/12/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation12/08/2009 Referred to
06/09/2010 Markup by
09/28/2010 Reported by S. Rept. 111-340

No related bill information was received for S.2847.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.2847. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-311 (12/15/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on September 29, 2010. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Commercial Advertisement Loudness Mitigation Act or the CALM Act - Directs the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) to prescribe a regulation limiting the volume of television advertisements that is limited to incorporating by reference and making mandatory (but subject to waivers) the "Recommended Practice: Techniques for Establishing and Maintaining Audio Loudness for Digital Television" insofar as such recommended practice concerns the transmission of commercial advertisements by a television broadcast station, cable operator, or other multichannel video programming distributor.

Deems a broadcast television operator, cable operator, or other multichannel video programming distributor that installs, utilizes, and maintains in a commercially reasonable manner the equipment and associated software in compliance with the regulations issued by the FCC in accordance with this Act to be in compliance with such regulations.