Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 12/08/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 12/15/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 12/16/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 12/18/2009
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 12/22/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/17/2010
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/12/2010