Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 12/21/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 12/21/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 12/21/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 12/21/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 12/21/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 12/21/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 02/09/2010
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 02/24/2010
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 02/25/2010
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/01/2010
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/14/2010
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/29/2010
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 11/29/2010
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 12/14/2010