Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 01/26/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 02/01/2010
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 02/01/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 02/04/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 02/22/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 02/25/2010