Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 01/28/2010
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 02/04/2010
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 02/04/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 02/26/2010
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/26/2010
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/13/2010
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 04/20/2010
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 04/28/2010