Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/04/2010
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/04/2010
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/04/2010
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 02/09/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 02/09/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 02/09/2010
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 02/09/2010
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/09/2010
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 02/09/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 02/09/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 02/09/2010
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 02/09/2010
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/09/2010
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 02/09/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 02/09/2010
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 02/09/2010
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/09/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 02/09/2010
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/09/2010
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/09/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 02/09/2010
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 02/09/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 02/09/2010
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 02/09/2010
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 02/09/2010
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 03/03/2010
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/04/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 03/18/2010
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/15/2010
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 07/28/2010
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 08/04/2010
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 09/14/2010
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/21/2010
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 11/15/2010
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 12/07/2010