Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/04/2010
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 02/22/2010
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 03/11/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/13/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 04/19/2010
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 04/29/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 05/12/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/13/2010
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/27/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/15/2010

Show cosponsors who withdrew