Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 02/04/2010
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/22/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 02/22/2010
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/01/2010
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/30/2010
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/15/2010