Text: S.3000 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/04/2010)


111th CONGRESS
2d Session
S. 3000


To extend the increase in the FMAP provided in the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009 for an additional 6 months.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

February 4, 2010

Mr. Rockefeller (for himself, Mr. Reid, Mr. Kerry, Mr. Harkin, Mr. Franken, Mr. Brown of Ohio, Mr. Begich, Mr. Levin, Mr. Durbin, Mrs. Gillibrand, Mr. Reed, Mr. Dodd, Mr. Whitehouse, Mr. Leahy, Mr. Kirk, Ms. Stabenow, Mr. Casey, Mr. Akaka, Mr. Burris, Mrs. Boxer, Mr. Schumer, Mr. Menendez, Mr. Lautenberg, Mr. Johnson, Ms. Mikulski, Mrs. Murray, Mr. Kaufman, Mr. Wyden, Mr. Bingaman, Mr. Specter, Mr. Cardin, Mr. Merkley, Ms. Cantwell, and Mrs. Shaheen) introduced the following bill; which was read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance


A BILL

To extend the increase in the FMAP provided in the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009 for an additional 6 months.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Extension of ARRA increase in FMAP.

Section 5001 of the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009 (Public Law 111–5) is amended—

(1) in subsection (a)(3), by striking “first calendar quarter” and inserting “first 3 calendar quarters”;

(2) in subsection (c)—

(A) in paragraph (2)(B), by striking “July 1, 2010” and inserting “January 1, 2011”;

(B) in paragraph (3)(B)(i), by striking “July 1, 2010” each place it appears and inserting “January 1, 2011”; and

(C) in paragraph (4)(C)(ii), by striking “the 3-consecutive-month period beginning with January 2010” and inserting “any 3-consecutive-month period that begins after December 2009 and ends before January 2011”;

(3) in subsection (g)—

(A) in paragraph (1), by striking “September 30, 2011” and inserting “March 31, 2012”; and

(B) in paragraph (2)—

(i) by inserting “of such Act” after “1923”; and

(ii) by adding at the end the following new sentence: “Voluntary contributions by a political subdivision to the non-Federal share of expenditures under the State Medicaid plan or to the non-Federal share of payments under section 1923 of the Social Security Act shall not be considered to be required contributions for purposes of this section.”; and

(4) in subsection (h)(3), by striking “December 31, 2010” and inserting “June 30, 2011”.