Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 02/24/2010
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/24/2010
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 02/24/2010
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/21/2010
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/28/2010
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/28/2010
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/28/2010
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/29/2010
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 06/29/2010
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 06/30/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/12/2010
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/12/2010
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/12/2010
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/13/2010
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/13/2010
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 07/13/2010
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/13/2010
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/19/2010
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/19/2010
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/19/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/19/2010
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/19/2010
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 07/19/2010
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 07/20/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/20/2010
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/20/2010
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/20/2010
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/20/2010
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 07/21/2010
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/21/2010
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 07/21/2010
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/22/2010
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/22/2010
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 07/22/2010
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 07/22/2010
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 07/22/2010
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/22/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 07/22/2010
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/22/2010
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 07/22/2010
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/22/2010
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 07/22/2010
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 07/30/2010
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 08/04/2010
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 08/04/2010