Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 02/24/2010
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/16/2010
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/16/2010
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 03/19/2010
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/26/2010
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/05/2010