There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

National Alzheimer's Project Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

National Alzheimer's Project Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

National Alzheimer's Project Act

Short Titles as Introduced

National Alzheimer's Project Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

A bill to establish the National Alzheimer's Project.

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to establish the Office of the National Alzheimer's Project.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
01/04/2011Became Public Law No: 111-375. (TXT | PDF)
01/04/2011Signed by President.
12/28/2010Presented to President.
12/15/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8369)
12/08/2010Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8654-8655; text as passed Senate: CR S8654-8655)
12/06/2010Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Harkin with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report.
02/24/2010Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/04/2011Became Public Law No: 111-375. (TXT | PDF)
01/04/2011Signed by President.
12/28/2010SenatePresented to President.
12/15/2010-11:48amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/15/2010-11:48amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8369)
12/15/2010-11:32amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3036.
12/15/2010-11:32amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8369-8372)
12/15/2010-11:32amHouseMr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/08/2010-9:28pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/08/2010SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/08/2010-7:45pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/08/2010SenatePassed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8654-8655; text as passed Senate: CR S8654-8655)
12/06/2010SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 675.
12/06/2010SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Harkin with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report.
12/01/2010SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
02/24/2010SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Cosponsors (33)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions02/24/2010 Referred to
12/01/2010 Markup by
12/06/2010 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.3036. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-375 (01/04/2011)


(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on December 8, 2010. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

National Alzheimer's Project Act - (Sec. 2) Establishes in the Office of the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) the National Alzheimer's Project.  Requires the Secretary to: (1) be responsible for the creation and maintenance of an integrated national plan to overcome Alzheimer's; (2) provide information and coordination of Alzheimer's research and services across all federal agencies; (3) accelerate the development of treatments that would prevent, halt, or reverse the course of Alzheimer's; (4) improve the early diagnosis of Alzheimer's disease and coordination of the care and treatment of citizens with Alzheimer's; (5) ensure the inclusion of ethnic and racial populations at higher risk for Alzheimer's, or least likely to receive care for Alzheimer's, in clinical, research, and service efforts with the purpose of decreasing health disparities in Alzheimer's; and (6) coordinate with international bodies to integrate and inform the fight against Alzheimer's globally.

Directs the Secretary to:(1) use discretionary authority to evaluate all federal programs around Alzheimer's, including budget requests and approvals; and (2) annually assess the nation's progress in preparing for the escalating burden of Alzheimer's.

Establishes an Advisory Council on Alzheimer's Research, Care, and Services to advise the Secretary and provide the Secretary and Congress with: (1) an initial evaluation of all federally -funded efforts in Alzheimer's research, clinical care, and institutional-, home-, and community-based programs and their outcomes; (2) initial recommendations for priority actions to expand, eliminate, coordinate, or condense programs based on their performance, mission, and purpose; (3) initial recommendations to improve health outcomes and reduce the financial impact of Alzheimer's on Medicare and other federally-funded programs and on families living with Alzheimer's disease; and (4) an annual evaluation of the implementation and outcomes of the recommendations through an updated national plan. Terminates the Advisory Council on December 31, 2025.

Directs federal agencies to share Alzheimer's data with the Secretary.

Sets forth reporting requirements.

Terminates the Project on December 31, 2025.