Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 02/25/2010
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 04/12/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/13/2010
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/20/2010
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 04/28/2010
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/29/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/06/2010
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/14/2010
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/20/2010
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/27/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/27/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/07/2010
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 09/20/2010
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/27/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 09/27/2010
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 12/07/2010