Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/02/2010
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 03/02/2010
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/02/2010
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 03/02/2010
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/02/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 03/02/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/02/2010
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/02/2010
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 03/02/2010
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/02/2010
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 03/02/2010
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/02/2010
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 03/02/2010
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 03/02/2010
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 03/02/2010
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 03/02/2010
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 03/02/2010
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/02/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 03/09/2010
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/09/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 03/09/2010
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/09/2010
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/09/2010
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 03/10/2010
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/10/2010
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/11/2010
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/11/2010
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/15/2010
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/16/2010
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 03/18/2010
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 03/18/2010
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 03/18/2010
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 03/23/2010
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/23/2010
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/25/2010
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 03/25/2010
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/25/2010
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/25/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 04/12/2010
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/12/2010
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 04/12/2010
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 04/22/2010
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/04/2010
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 05/04/2010
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 05/04/2010
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/06/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/06/2010
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/10/2010
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/10/2010
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 05/12/2010
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 05/14/2010
Sen. LeMieux, George S. [R-FL] 05/20/2010
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 05/24/2010
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/24/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/07/2010
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/07/2010
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/07/2010
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/09/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/22/2010
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/29/2010
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 11/18/2010