Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 03/04/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 03/04/2010
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 03/04/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 03/04/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 03/04/2010
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/04/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 05/05/2010
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/12/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/30/2010
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 12/10/2010