Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 03/04/2010
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 03/04/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 03/04/2010
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 03/04/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 03/04/2010
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 03/15/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 04/26/2010
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/06/2010
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 05/24/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/19/2010
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/22/2010
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/22/2010
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 07/26/2010