Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 03/10/2010
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 03/10/2010
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 03/10/2010
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 03/10/2010
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 03/10/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/24/2010
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 04/15/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/19/2010
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 05/03/2010
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/03/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 05/04/2010
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/06/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 05/11/2010
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/12/2010
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/12/2010
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 05/24/2010
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/07/2010
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 06/14/2010