Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 03/11/2010
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 03/11/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 03/11/2010
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 03/11/2010
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/14/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/14/2010
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/19/2010
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 04/26/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 05/19/2010