Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 02/13/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/01/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 06/01/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/15/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/25/2010
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 05/17/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/22/2010
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/23/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 06/29/2010
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/15/2010
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 08/04/2010