Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 03/16/2010
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 03/16/2010
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 03/16/2010
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 03/16/2010
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 03/16/2010
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/18/2010
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 03/19/2010
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 04/13/2010
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 04/21/2010
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 06/10/2010
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/30/2010