Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA]* 03/16/2010
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/16/2010
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 03/16/2010
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 03/16/2010
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 03/16/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 03/16/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 03/16/2010
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 03/16/2010
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 03/16/2010
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/16/2010
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/16/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/16/2010
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 03/16/2010
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/22/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 03/23/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/24/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 03/25/2010