Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 03/23/2010
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 03/23/2010
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 03/23/2010
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 03/23/2010
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 03/23/2010
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 03/23/2010
Sen. LeMieux, George S. [R-FL]* 03/23/2010
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 03/23/2010
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 03/23/2010
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 03/23/2010
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 03/23/2010
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 03/23/2010
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 03/24/2010
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 03/24/2010
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 03/24/2010
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 04/20/2010
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/20/2010
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 04/20/2010
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/20/2010
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 04/20/2010
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/29/2010
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 11/15/2010