Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/25/2010
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/25/2010
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 03/26/2010
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 04/12/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/13/2010
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/15/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 04/26/2010
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 04/29/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/30/2010
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 05/10/2010
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 05/10/2010
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/10/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 05/12/2010