Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 03/25/2010
Sen. LeMieux, George S. [R-FL] 04/15/2010
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/15/2010
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/15/2010
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 04/15/2010
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 04/20/2010
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 04/20/2010
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/24/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/09/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 06/24/2010
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/12/2010