Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 03/25/2010
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/28/2010
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/29/2010
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/14/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 09/14/2010
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 11/17/2010