Text: S.3186 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-151 (03/26/2010)

 
[111th Congress Public Law 151]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]



[[Page 124 STAT. 1027]]

Public Law 111-151
111th Congress

                                 An Act


 
 To reauthorize the Satellite Home Viewer Extension and Reauthorization 
Act of 2004 through April 30, 2010, and for other purposes. <<NOTE: Mar. 
                        26, 2010 -  [S. 3186]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled, <<NOTE: Satellite 
Television Extension Act of 2010.>> 
SECTION 1. <<NOTE: 17 USC 101 note.>> SHORT TITLE; TABLE OF 
                              CONTENTS.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Satellite Televison Extension Act of 
2010''.
SEC. 2. SATELLITE TELEVISION EXTENSION.

    (a) Amendments to Section 119 of Title 17, United States Code.--
            (1) In general.--Section 119 of title 17, United States 
        Code, is amended--
                    (A) in subsection (c)(1)(E), by striking ``March 28, 
                2010'' and inserting ``April 30, 2010''; and
                    (B) in subsection (e), by striking ``March 28, 
                2010'' and inserting ``April 30, 2010''.
            (2) Termination of license.--Section 1003(a)(2)(A) of Public 
        Law 111-118 <<NOTE: 17 USC 119 note.>>  is amended by striking 
        ``March 28, 2010'', and inserting ``April 30, 2010''.

    (b) Amendments to Communications Act of 1934.--Section 325(b) of the 
Communications Act of 1934 (47 U.S.C. 325(b)) is amended--
            (1) in paragraph (2)(C), by striking ``March 28, 2010'' and 
        inserting ``April 30, 2010''; and

[[Page 124 STAT. 1028]]

            (2) in paragraph (3)(C), by striking ``March 29, 2010'' each 
        place it appears in clauses (ii) and (iii) and inserting ``May 
        1, 2010''.

    Approved March 26, 2010.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--S. 3186:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 156 (2010):
            Mar. 25, considered and passed Senate and House.

                                  <all>