Text: S.3187 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

  • TXT
  • PDF (PDF provides a complete and accurate display of this text.) Tip?

Shown Here:
Considered and Passed Senate (03/25/2010)

 
[Congressional Bills 111th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[S. 3187 Considered and Passed Senate (CPS)]

111th CONGRESS
  2d Session
                                S. 3187

 To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to extend the funding and 
 expenditure authority of the Airport and Airway Trust Fund, to amend 
title 49, United States Code, to extend authorizations for the airport 
              improvement program, and for other purposes.


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                             March 25, 2010

 Mr. Rockefeller introduced the following bill; which was read twice, 
              considered, read the third time, and passed

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 A BILL


 
 To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to extend the funding and 
 expenditure authority of the Airport and Airway Trust Fund, to amend 
title 49, United States Code, to extend authorizations for the airport 
              improvement program, and for other purposes.

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Federal Aviation Administration 
Extension Act of 2010''.

SEC. 2. EXTENSION OF TAXES FUNDING AIRPORT AND AIRWAY TRUST FUND.

    (a) Fuel Taxes.--Subparagraph (B) of section 4081(d)(2) of the 
Internal Revenue Code of 1986 is amended by striking ``March 31, 2010'' 
and inserting ``April 30, 2010''.
    (b) Ticket Taxes.--
            (1) Persons.--Clause (ii) of section 4261(j)(1)(A) of the 
        Internal Revenue Code of 1986 is amended by striking ``March 
        31, 2010'' and inserting ``April 30, 2010''.
            (2) Property.--Clause (ii) of section 4271(d)(1)(A) of such 
        Code is amended by striking ``March 31, 2010'' and inserting 
        ``April 30, 2010''.
    (c) Effective Date.--The amendments made by this section shall take 
effect on April 1, 2010.

SEC. 3. EXTENSION OF AIRPORT AND AIRWAY TRUST FUND EXPENDITURE 
              AUTHORITY.

    (a) In General.--Paragraph (1) of section 9502(d) of the Internal 
Revenue Code of 1986 is amended--
            (1) by striking ``April 1, 2010'' and inserting ``May 1, 
        2010''; and
            (2) by inserting ``or the Federal Aviation Administration 
        Extension Act of 2010'' before the semicolon at the end of 
        subparagraph (A).
    (b) Conforming Amendment.--Paragraph (2) of section 9502(e) of such 
Code is amended by striking ``April 1, 2010'' and inserting ``May 1, 
2010''.
    (c) Effective Date.--The amendments made by this section shall take 
effect on April 1, 2010.

SEC. 4. EXTENSION OF AIRPORT IMPROVEMENT PROGRAM.

    (a) Authorization of Appropriations.--
            (1) In general.--Section 48103(7) of title 49, United 
        States Code, is amended to read as follows:
            ``(7) $2,333,333,333 for the 7-month period beginning on 
        October 1, 2009.''.
            (2) Obligation of amounts.--Sums made available pursuant to 
        the amendment made by paragraph (1) may be obligated at any 
        time through September 30, 2010, and shall remain available 
        until expended.
            (3) Program implementation.--For purposes of calculating 
        funding apportionments and meeting other requirements under 
        sections 47114, 47115, 47116, and 47117 of title 49, United 
        States Code, for the 7-month period beginning on October 1, 
        2009, the Administrator of the Federal Aviation Administration 
        shall--
                    (A) first calculate funding apportionments on an 
                annualized basis as if the total amount available under 
                section 48103 of such title for fiscal year 2010 were 
                $4,000,000,000; and
                    (B) then reduce by 42 percent--
                            (i) all funding apportionments calculated 
                        under subparagraph (A); and
                            (ii) amounts available pursuant to sections 
                        47117(b) and 47117(f)(2) of such title.
    (b) Project Grant Authority.--Section 47104(c) of such title is 
amended by striking ``March 31, 2010,'' and inserting ``April 30, 
2010,''.

SEC. 5. EXTENSION OF EXPIRING AUTHORITIES.

    (a) Section 40117(l)(7) of title 49, United States Code, is amended 
by striking ``April 1, 2010.'' and inserting ``May 1, 2010.''.
    (b) Section 44302(f)(1) of such title is amended--
            (1) by striking ``March 31, 2010,'' and inserting ``April 
        30, 2010,''; and
            (2) by striking ``June 30, 2010,'' and inserting ``July 31, 
        2010,''.
    (c) Section 44303(b) of such title is amended by striking ``June 
30, 2010,'' and inserting ``July 31, 2010,''.
    (d) Section 47107(s)(3) of such title is amended by striking 
``April 1, 2010.'' and inserting ``May 1, 2010.''.
    (e) Section 47115(j) of such title is amended by striking ``April 
1, 2010,'' and inserting ``May 1, 2010,''.
    (f) Section 47141(f) of such title is amended by striking ``March 
31, 2010.'' and inserting ``April 30, 2010.''.
    (g) Section 49108 of such title is amended by striking ``March 31, 
2010,'' and inserting ``April 30, 2010,''.
    (h) Section 161 of the Vision 100--Century of Aviation 
Reauthorization Act (49 U.S.C. 47109 note) is amended by striking 
``April 1, 2010,'' and inserting ``May 1, 2010,''.
    (i) Section 186(d) of such Act (117 Stat. 2518) is amended by 
striking ``April 1, 2010,'' and inserting ``May 1, 2010,''.
    (j) The amendments made by this section shall take effect on April 
1, 2010.

SEC. 6. FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION OPERATIONS.

    Section 106(k)(1)(F) of title 49, United States Code, is amended to 
read as follows:
                    ``(F) $5,454,183,000 for the 7-month period 
                beginning on October 1, 2009.''.

SEC. 7. AIR NAVIGATION FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT.

    Section 48101(a)(6) of title 49, United States Code, is amended to 
read as follows:
            ``(6) $1,712,785,083 for the 7-month period beginning on 
        October 1, 2009.''.

SEC. 8. RESEARCH, ENGINEERING, AND DEVELOPMENT.

    Section 48102(a)(14) of title 49, United States Code, is amended to 
read as follows:
            ``(14) $111,125,000 for the 7-month period beginning on 
        October 1, 2009.''.
                                 <all>