Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 04/15/2010
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC]* 04/15/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 04/15/2010
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/19/2010
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/06/2010
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/11/2010
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 06/14/2010
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 06/14/2010
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/16/2010
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/21/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 06/30/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 08/03/2010
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/18/2010