Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 04/19/2010
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 04/19/2010
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 04/19/2010
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 04/19/2010
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 04/19/2010
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 04/19/2010
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 04/19/2010
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 04/19/2010
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 04/19/2010
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 04/19/2010
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 11/18/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 11/18/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 11/18/2010
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 11/30/2010
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 12/15/2010
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 12/16/2010