Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 04/20/2010
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 04/20/2010
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 04/20/2010
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 04/20/2010
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 04/20/2010
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 04/20/2010
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 04/22/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/12/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 05/26/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/09/2010
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/28/2010
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/15/2010