Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR]* 04/20/2010
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 04/20/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 04/20/2010
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 04/20/2010
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 04/20/2010
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 04/20/2010
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/29/2010
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/03/2010
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/17/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/25/2010
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/08/2010
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/22/2010
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/23/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/14/2010
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/23/2010
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/23/2010
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/29/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 11/15/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 11/17/2010
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 12/08/2010