Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA]* 04/21/2010
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 04/21/2010
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 04/21/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 04/21/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 04/21/2010
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 05/03/2010
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/10/2010
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/16/2010
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/21/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/12/2010
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/12/2010
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/13/2010
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 07/20/2010
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 07/21/2010