Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 04/22/2010
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/19/2010
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/08/2010
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/29/2010
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/13/2010