Text: S.3253 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-162 (04/30/2010)

 
[111th Congress Public Law 162]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]



[[Page 124 STAT. 1129]]

Public Law 111-162
111th Congress

                                 An Act


 
 To provide for an additional temporary extension of programs under the 
 Small Business Act and the Small Business Investment Act of 1958, and 
        for other purposes. <<NOTE: Apr. 30, 2010 -  [S. 3253]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,
SECTION 1. ADDITIONAL TEMPORARY EXTENSION OF AUTHORIZATION OF 
                              PROGRAMS UNDER THE SMALL BUSINESS 
                              ACT AND THE SMALL BUSINESS 
                              INVESTMENT ACT OF 1958.

    (a) In General.--Section 1 of the Act entitled ``An Act to extend 
temporarily certain authorities of the Small Business Administration'', 
approved October 10, 2006 (Public Law 109-316; 120 Stat. 1742), as most 
recently amended by section 1 of Public Law 111-136 (124 Stat. 6), is 
amended by striking ``April 30, 2010'' each place it appears and 
inserting ``July 31, 2010''.
    (b) Effective Date.--The amendments made by subsection (a) shall 
take effect on April 29, 2010.

    Approved April 30, 2010.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--S. 3253:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 156 (2010):
            Apr. 22, considered and passed Senate.
            Apr. 27, considered and passed House.

                                  <all>