Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 04/26/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 04/26/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 04/29/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/24/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/24/2010
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/30/2010
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/27/2010
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 11/17/2010
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/30/2010