Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 04/29/2010
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 04/29/2010
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/19/2010
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 05/20/2010
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/08/2010
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/09/2010
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/24/2010