Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 04/29/2010
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 04/29/2010
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 04/29/2010
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 04/29/2010
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 04/29/2010
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/29/2010
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 04/29/2010
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 04/29/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 04/29/2010
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 04/29/2010
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 05/20/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/14/2010
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/22/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/29/2010
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 12/15/2010