Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 04/30/2010
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 04/30/2010
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 04/30/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 04/30/2010
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 04/30/2010
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 04/30/2010
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 04/30/2010
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 04/30/2010
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 04/30/2010
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 04/30/2010
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 04/30/2010
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA]* 04/30/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 04/30/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 04/30/2010
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE]* 04/30/2010
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 04/30/2010
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 04/30/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 04/30/2010
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 04/30/2010
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 04/30/2010
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 04/30/2010
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 04/30/2010
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 04/30/2010
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 04/30/2010
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 04/30/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 04/30/2010
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 04/30/2010
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 04/30/2010
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 04/30/2010
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 04/30/2010
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 04/30/2010
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 04/30/2010
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 04/30/2010
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 04/30/2010
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 04/30/2010
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 04/30/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL]* 04/30/2010
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 05/03/2010
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 05/03/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/03/2010
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 05/04/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/05/2010
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/11/2010
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/13/2010
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 05/13/2010
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/26/2010
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/07/2010
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/15/2010
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 06/17/2010