Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 05/04/2010
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 05/04/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 05/04/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 05/04/2010
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 05/04/2010
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 05/04/2010
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/05/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/05/2010
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 05/06/2010
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/06/2010
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/07/2010
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/12/2010
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 05/19/2010
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/20/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 05/20/2010
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/25/2010
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/25/2010
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/07/2010