Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/06/2010
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 05/06/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/11/2010
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/18/2010
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/20/2010
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/25/2010
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/27/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/08/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/14/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/21/2010