Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/12/2010
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/20/2010
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 06/09/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/14/2010
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/22/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 09/13/2010