There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to modify the date on which the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency and applicable States may require permits for discharges from certain vessels.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
07/30/2010Became Public Law No: 111-215. (TXT | PDF)
07/30/2010Signed by President.
07/30/2010Presented to President.
07/29/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 7/30/2010 H6428)
07/14/2010Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5867; text as passed Senate: CR S5867)
06/18/2010Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Boxer without amendment. With written report No. 111-209.
05/13/2010Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
07/30/2010Became Public Law No: 111-215. (TXT | PDF)
07/30/2010Signed by President.
07/30/2010SenatePresented to President.
07/29/2010-11:49pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/29/2010-11:49pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 7/30/2010 H6428)
07/29/2010-11:46pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3372.
07/29/2010-11:46pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR 7/30/2010 6428-6429)
07/29/2010-11:46pmHouseMs. Johnson, E. B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/15/2010-4:14pmHouseHeld at the desk.
07/15/2010SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/15/2010-10:08amHouseReceived in the House.
07/14/2010SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5867; text as passed Senate: CR S5867)
06/18/2010SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 433.
06/18/2010SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Boxer without amendment. With written report No. 111-209.
05/20/2010SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
05/13/2010SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works05/13/2010 Referred to
05/20/2010 Markup by
06/18/2010 Reported by S. Rept. 111-209

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.3372. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-215 (07/30/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Extends until December 18, 2013, provisions prohibiting the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA), or a state with an approved National Pollutant Discharge Elimination System (NPDES) permit program under the Federal Water Pollution Control Act (commonly known as the Clean Water Act), from requiring an NPDES permit for a covered vessel (a vessel that is less than 79 feet in length or a fishing vessel) for any discharge: (1) of effluent from properly functioning marine engines; (2) of laundry, shower, and galley sink wastes; or (3) that is incidental to the normal operation of a covered vessel.