Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 05/24/2010
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/24/2010
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 05/24/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/21/2010
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/12/2010
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 07/14/2010
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/22/2010
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/29/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 08/02/2010
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 08/03/2010