Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 05/25/2010
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 05/25/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/10/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/21/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/23/2010
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 08/02/2010