Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 05/25/2010
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 05/25/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 05/25/2010
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 05/25/2010
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 05/25/2010
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 05/25/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 05/25/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 05/27/2010
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/09/2010
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/09/2010
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/14/2010
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 06/23/2010