Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 05/25/2010
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/26/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/28/2010
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/12/2010
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 07/15/2010
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/15/2010
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/15/2010
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/28/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 09/13/2010
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/21/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/27/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/29/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 11/15/2010
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 11/15/2010
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 11/17/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 12/09/2010
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 12/21/2010
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 12/21/2010
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 12/22/2010